Elections, State Board of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0137Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of IdentityDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0196 / CH0198
    (SB0171 / CH0197)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0217
    (SB0373)
Early Voting Access Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0233Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0325Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0570State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0592Election Law - Reporting of Precinct ResultsDelegate KaiserIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0729
    (SB0367)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0758Election Law - Polling Places - Waiting Times to VoteDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0974Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot ListDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0171 / CH0197
    (HB0196 / CH0198)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by MailSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0367
    (HB0729)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialitySenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0373
    (HB0217)
Early Voting Access Act of 2013Senator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0901Election Law - Elections by MailSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1056Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - DisclosureSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.