Elections, State Board of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB0212Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased VotersDelegate AfzaliIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB0418
    (SB0691)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0483State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0698Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0942State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State OfficialsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1094Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of IdentityDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1217Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1406 / CH0655Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - MaintenanceDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1412Election Law - Petitions - Advance DeterminationsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0015 / CH0467Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased VotersSenator JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0691
    (HB0418)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0848Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation SummarySenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0931State Board of Elections - Provision of Professional Legal AssistanceSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1043Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive StatusSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.