Electronic Commerce

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0083 / CH0585
    (SB0240)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0098
    (SB0154 / CH0042)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0244
    (SB0776)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0801
    (SB0368)
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership, Duties, and Termination DateDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0830
    (SB0287)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0877Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll ExpensesDelegate WeirIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1160
    (SB0919)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1254Environment - Dental Amalgam - Reduction in UseDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1352 / CH0654
    (SB0964)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1365Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding ActDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing cancelledRules and Executive Nominations Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0100 / CH0027Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative ExpensesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0154 / CH0042
    (HB0098)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0240
    (HB0083 / CH0585)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0287
    (HB0830)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0368
    (HB0801)
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership and Termination DateSenator PughIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0374 / CH0293State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery RevenueSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0776
    (HB0244)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0919
    (HB1160)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0964
    (HB1352 / CH0654)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.