Electronic Funds Transfer

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0300 / CH0451Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1364State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience FeeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.