Emergency Medical Services

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0019Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0100 / CH0154
    (SB0597 / CH0153)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0170Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0175Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0216
    (SB0269)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilityDelegate LamIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0346 / CH0118Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers MC 1-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0388
    (SB0322)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0446 / CH0178
    (SB0909 / CH0177)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0522 / CH0035
    (SB0427 / CH0034)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Delegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0541
    (SB0474)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesDelegate HayesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0598Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0979Property Tax Credit - Public Safety OfficersDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1084
    (SB1104)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1436Civil Actions - Duty to Render AssistanceDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0120Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0169Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - StudySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0269
    (HB0216)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilitySenator LeeIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0322
    (HB0388)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0427 / CH0034
    (HB0522 / CH0035)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0474
    (HB0541)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0584
    (HB1468)
Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical RecordsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0597 / CH0153
    (HB0100 / CH0154)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0909 / CH0177
    (HB0446 / CH0178)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1104
    (HB1084)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1130Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and ContractsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:01 P.M.