Energy Matters

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0110Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - ExtensionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0356Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore CityDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0406 / CH0362
    (SB0315)
Clean Cars Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0410 / CH0364
    (SB0313 / CH0365)
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation InstituteSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0490
    (SB0758 / CH0389)
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage SystemsDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0514 / CH0780
    (SB0184 / CH0014)
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-EffectivenessDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0588Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling EquipmentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0773 / CH0382
    (SB0715)
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology StudyDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0970Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0996
    (SB0771)
Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System CostsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1395Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy StorageDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1406Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1414 / CH0393
    (SB1146)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudyDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1419Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1452
    (SB1043)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer ServiceDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1454Task Force on Electric Power Grid SecurityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1457Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - RevisionsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1512
    (SB0942)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1535Income Tax Credit - HVAC Air Stratification TechnologyDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1548
    (SB0926)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertyDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0184 / CH0014
    (HB0514 / CH0780)
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-EffectivenessSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0313 / CH0365
    (HB0410 / CH0364)
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation InstitutePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0315
    (HB0406 / CH0362)
Clean Cars Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0715
    (HB0773 / CH0382)
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology StudySenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0758 / CH0389
    (HB0490)
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage SystemsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0771
    (HB0996)
Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System CostsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0926
    (HB1548)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0942
    (HB1512)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1043
    (HB1452)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer ServiceSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1146
    (HB1414 / CH0393)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:45 A.M.