Enterprise Zones

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0182 / CH0075Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage LoansDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0419
    (SB0709)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User ConflictsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1047Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Economically Disadvantaged Individuals - Qualified Ex-FelonsDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0507Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0709
    (HB0419)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User ConflictsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.