Environment, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0080Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized UsesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0047Environment - Mercury - Dental AmalgamDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0050
    (SB0464)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0097
    (SB0005)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0155Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration ProgramDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0189 / CH0549
    (SB0711 / CH0548)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilityDelegate SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0240
    (SB0056)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Environment (M3)
HB0737State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy AnalysesDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0865Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0888Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration RequirementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0895Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0910Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required StudiesDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0945Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification RequirementsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1073Environment - Statute of Limitations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1081Composting and Anaerobic Digestion Facilities - Yard Waste and Food ResidualsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1122
    (SB0745)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1180Income Tax Credit - Environmental Improvement EquipmentDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1210
    (SB0706)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1373Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on IssuanceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1383Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0005
    (HB0097)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
SB0056
    (HB0240)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0101 / CH0028Environment - Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund - Use of FundsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0135Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - MoratoriumSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0141 / CH0471Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental CitationsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0464
    (HB0050)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0535Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0631Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0678 / CH0325Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0706
    (HB1210)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0711 / CH0548
    (HB0189 / CH0549)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilitySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0745
    (HB1122)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.