Environmental Health

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0080Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized UsesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0047Environment - Mercury - Dental AmalgamDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0166
    (SB0449)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0189 / CH0549
    (SB0711 / CH0548)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilityDelegate SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0628 / CH0285
    (SB0238 / CH0284)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1191
    (SB0778)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1210
    (SB0706)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1258 / CH0649Health Occupations - Maryland Environmental Health Specialists Act - RevisionsDelegate PendergrassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 649Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1291Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1430 / CH0656Health - State Children's Environmental Health and Protection Advisory Council - CompositionDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1539
    (SB1096)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanDelegate SmigielIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Environment (M3)
SB0238 / CH0284
    (HB0628 / CH0285)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0449
    (HB0166)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0535Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0631Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0706
    (HB1210)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0711 / CH0548
    (HB0189 / CH0549)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilitySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0778
    (HB1191)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1096
    (HB1539)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.