Environmental Health

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk ReductionDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0354
    (SB0624)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0414
    (SB0355 / CH0388)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0597Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel RoomsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1290State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air QualityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1330Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1414 / CH0393
    (SB1146)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudyDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0355 / CH0388
    (HB0414)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0537Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0624
    (HB0354)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0715
    (HB0773 / CH0382)
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology StudySenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0773Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1146
    (HB1414 / CH0393)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.