Escrow Accounts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0293State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - SecurityDelegate HubbardVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1187
    (SB0887 / CH0572)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0140 / CH0023State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - SecuritySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0854 / CH0568Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial AssuranceSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0887 / CH0572
    (HB1187)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.