Estate Tax

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0308 / CH0021
    (SB0646 / CH0015)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate TarlauEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0561Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0646 / CH0015
    (HB0308 / CH0021)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 1:38 P.M.