Ethics

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0136 / CH0106Insurance - Public AdjustersChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0438
    (SB0253)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0808
    (SB0660)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0879 / CH0031
    (SB0683)
Public Integrity Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEthics (G2)
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB0897
    (SB0684)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0898 / CH0852Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Ethics (G2)
HB1044
    (SB0992)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1073
    (SB0973)
Maryland Technology Development CorporationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1214
    (SB1013)
Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - LicensureDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1241Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1310Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1386 / CH0519Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control BoardsDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Environment and Transportation
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1458State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists ActDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1619 / CH0575
    (SB1148)
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - EstablishmentDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1631
    (SB1026)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0018 / CH0283Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial DisclosureChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0550
    (HB0976)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0660
    (HB0808)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0683
    (HB0879 / CH0031)
Public Integrity Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0684
    (HB0897)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0973
    (HB1073)
Maryland Technology Development CorporationSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0992
    (HB1044)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1013
    (HB1214)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental TherapySenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1026
    (HB1631)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB1148
    (HB1619 / CH0575)
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - EstablishmentSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.