Ethnic Affairs

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0034 / CH0347
    (SB0017)
State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage MonthDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0077 / CH0607
    (SB0007)
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage MonthDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0939
    (SB0402)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 RenovationsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1468
    (SB1007)
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration ProjectDelegate EckardtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0007
    (HB0077 / CH0607)
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage MonthSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0017
    (HB0034 / CH0347)
State Government - Commemorative Day - German-American Heritage DaySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0402
    (HB0939)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 RenovationsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1007
    (HB1468)
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration ProjectSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.