Excise Tax

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0110Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - ExtensionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0406 / CH0362
    (SB0315)
Clean Cars Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1186
    (SB0927)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1360
    (SB0449 / CH0663)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0315
    (HB0406 / CH0362)
Clean Cars Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0449 / CH0663
    (HB1360)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0927
    (HB1186)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:34 A.M.