Excise Tax

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1065 / CH0512
    (SB0768)
Vehicle Laws - Title Service AgentsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1091
    (SB1030)
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0177Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 ApplicantsSenator MannoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0606 / CH0700Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail FundSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 700Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0768
    (HB1065 / CH0512)
Vehicle Laws - Title Service AgentsSenator ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:11 P.M.