Ex-Offenders

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0124
    (SB0651 / CH0374)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Conviction of a Crime That Is No Longer a CrimeDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0220
    (SB0273)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0244 / CH0313
    (SB0526)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Delegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0347Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification EffortsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0423
    (SB0212)
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate Young, K.In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0615Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0757
    (SB0883)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives ExpansionDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0857
    (SB0530)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0909
    (SB0582 / CH0315)
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-OffendersDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0971Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership FundDelegate OaksVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0980
    (SB0340)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsDelegate McCrayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1047Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Economically Disadvantaged Individuals - Qualified Ex-FelonsDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1083
    (SB0550)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1113 / CH0299Video Lottery Facilities - Operation and Employee Licenses - Crimes or Acts of Moral Turpitude or GamblingChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0212
    (HB0423)
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System ProgramSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0273
    (HB0220)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0340
    (HB0980)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0395Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0526
    (HB0244 / CH0313)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0530
    (HB0857)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0550
    (HB1083)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0582 / CH0315
    (HB0909)
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-OffendersSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0641 / CH0045Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership FundSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0651 / CH0374
    (HB0124)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Conviction of a Crime That Is No Longer a CrimeSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0686
    (HB1059)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0883
    (HB0757)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives ExpansionSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.