Ex-Offenders

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0440
    (SB0055)
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - ImmunityDelegate CassillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0694
    (SB0543)
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)Delegate McIntoshVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0847Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Benefits for Individuals Who Are Incarcerated or InstitutionalizedDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0860 / CH0793
    (SB0853 / CH0792)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Delegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1381 / CH0608
    (SB0866 / CH0609)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1465Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering CommitteeDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1552
    (SB0766)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle PermitsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0055
    (HB0440)
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - ImmunitySenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0408Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0543
    (HB0694)
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)Senator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0561Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - IneligibilitySenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0766
    (HB1552)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle PermitsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0853 / CH0792
    (HB0860 / CH0793)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0866 / CH0609
    (HB1381 / CH0608)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0922Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - ApplicantsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.