Ex-Offenders

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0122
    (SB0938)
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated DelinquentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0476Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act)Delegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0541Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0678Criminal Law - Sentencing - Subsequent Offenders (Career Criminal Truth in Sentencing Act)Delegate BuckelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0861Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0991
    (SB1062)
Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – PossessionBaltimore City DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1029 / CH0146Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent OffenderDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1597 / CH0796Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – ReportsDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 796Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0938
    (HB0122)
Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated DelinquentSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1062
    (HB0991)
Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - PossessionBaltimore City SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.