Farmland

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0155 / CH0114Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement TerminationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0586 / CH0395
    (SB0278 / CH0396)
Maryland Farms and Families ActDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Agriculture (M4)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0779
    (SB0719)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Delegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1063 / CH0373Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils ProgramDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1307
    (SB1016)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1420Alcoholic Beverages - Modern Brewery LicenseDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1531Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Winery Licenses - Auxiliary Winery PermitsDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1592
    (SB0931)
Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating StationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0278 / CH0396
    (HB0586 / CH0395)
Maryland Farms and Families ActSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0719
    (HB0779)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Senator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0931
    (HB1592)
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive PlanSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB1016
    (HB1307)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.