Financial Institutions

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187 / CH0479
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0200 / CH0160
    (SB0064 / CH0159)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0275 / CH0108St. Mary's County - Metropolitan CommissionSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0463
    (SB0972)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0737Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Bank StatementsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0791
    (SB0748)
Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1102 / CH0115Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise FundCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1297 / CH0790Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 790Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1608Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust AccountsDelegate MorganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1647Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0006
    (HB0187 / CH0479)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0064 / CH0159
    (HB0200 / CH0160)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0578 / CH0424
    (HB0633 / CH0423)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0632
    (HB0817)
Maryland Smart Growth Investment FundSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedFinance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0748
    (HB0791)
Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0755 / CH0340Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities AssessmentsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0972
    (HB0463)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsSenator MannoIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1209
    (HB1158)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.