Financial Regulation, Division of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1642
    (SB1012)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – OmbudsmanDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1647Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB1012
    (HB1642)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of ServicersSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.