Fish and Fishing

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0363
    (SB0305)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1137 / CH0518Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster DiversDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1172 / CH0520
    (SB0558)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1174Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood DealersDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1249Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in JulyDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1284Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application RequirementsDelegate CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1426Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery AreasDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1485 / CH0531Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf OwnersDelegate FisherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1547Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - ReciprocityDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1693Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum AgeDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1812Natural Resources - Haul Seines - Anne Arundel CountyDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0112 / CH0061Natural Resources - Tidal Fish LicensesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0113 / CH0062Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount ProgramChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0183Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - DonationsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Second Reading PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0305
    (HB0363)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0558
    (HB1172 / CH0520)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.