Flood Control

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031
    (SB0057)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0082Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold InterestsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0178Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and ProtectionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0415
    (SB0419)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0880Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and PermittingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1108Environment - Municipal Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to ChargesDelegate GilchristIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0057
    (HB0031)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0419
    (HB0415)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0719Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - MunicipalitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.