Forests and Parks

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0080
    (SB0239)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Warner ManorDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0289
    (SB0039)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management ProjectDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0302
    (SB0028)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0315
    (SB0289)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Lake Roland Education CenterDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0467
    (SB0341)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Josiah Henson ParkDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0513Natural Resources - Forest Harvesting - Public Notice of Process and LicenseesDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0585 / CH0438Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0750 / CH0272
    (SB0116)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt ParkDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB0764
    (SB0307)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park ScoreboardsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0925
    (SB0744 / CH0196)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer ParkDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1063
    (SB0741)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Manor Dog ParkDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1147
    (SB0822)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Angel ParkDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1194
    (SB0746)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Cushwa Basin AreaDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1245
    (SB0890)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Park Berkshire Neighborhood ParkDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0028
    (HB0302)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0039
    (HB0289)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management ProjectSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0116
    (HB0750 / CH0272)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt ParkSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0239
    (HB0080)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Warner ManorSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0289
    (HB0315)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Lake Roland Education CenterSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0307
    (HB0764)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park ScoreboardsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0341
    (HB0467)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Josiah Henson ParkSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0741
    (HB1063)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Manor Dog ParkSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0744 / CH0196
    (HB0925)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer ParkSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0746
    (HB1194)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Cushwa Basin AreaSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0822
    (HB1147)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Angel ParkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0862 / CH0389Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated AppropriationSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0890
    (HB1245)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Park Berkshire Neighborhood ParkSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.