Foster Care

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001
    (SB0064 / CH0468)
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational StabilityChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0699 / CH0419Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster ParentsDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1270
    (SB0914)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1307 / CH0451Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of BenefitsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1324Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0064 / CH0468
    (HB0001)
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational StabilityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0096 / CH0023Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0144 / CH0039Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0914
    (HB1270)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.