Fuel

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0342 / CH0060
    (SB0277 / CH0059)
Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - SalesDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0363Public Health - Smart Meters - Report on Public Health ImpactDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPublic Health (J1)
HB0406
    (SB0870)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0546
    (SB0510)
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure InvestmentsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0571Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0711
    (SB0643)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas CodesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0817Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Repeal of Administrative PenaltiesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0820
    (SB0398)
Reducing Environmental Degradation for the Underserved Through Community Engagement (The REDUCE Act)Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0880Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and PermittingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0931Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1112Environment - Gas Storage Wells and Facilities - Safety RegulationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1279Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy Consumption by RestaurantsDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1290Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate InformationDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1307
    (SB1010)
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation CostsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1324
    (SB0778)
Public Utilities - Natural Gas Infrastructure Expansion and ReinforcementDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1354Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1355Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1434Rail Safety Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1455Transportation - Highway User Revenue - RestorationDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0105Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and AuthorityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0125Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0275
    (HB0092)
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0277 / CH0059
    (HB0342 / CH0060)
Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - SalesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0361Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0398
    (HB0820)
Reducing Environmental Degradation for the Underserved Through Community Engagement (The REDUCE Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0454Sales and Use Tax - Manufacturing Businesses - Exemption for Energy CostsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0510
    (HB0546)
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure InvestmentsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0511Taxes - Sales and Use Tax - RepealSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0643
    (HB0711)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas CodesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0659Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0778
    (HB1324)
Public Utilities - Natural Gas Infrastructure Expansion and ReinforcementSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0870
    (HB0406)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1010
    (HB1307)
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation CostsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1127Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required SignsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.