Fuel

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0055 / CH0238
    (SB0054)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0296Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0356Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore CityDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0414
    (SB0355)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0588Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling EquipmentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0956Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Retail Service Station - Attendant RequiredDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0969Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt BikeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1325 / CH0013
    (SB0740)
Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB1406Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1419Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1434Business Regulation - Marina Fuel Sales - Fuel SalesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1473
    (SB1082)
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1533
    (SB0658)
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - ProhibitionDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0054
    (HB0055 / CH0238)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0158Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0355
    (HB0414)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0658
    (HB1533)
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - ProhibitionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0740
    (HB1325 / CH0013)
Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0847Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required SignageSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0980
    (HB1461)
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution FundSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1082
    (HB1473)
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:48 P.M.