Fuel Tax

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0116Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0406
    (SB0870)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0756
    (SB0520 / CH0397)
Washington County - Board of Education - Motor Fuel Tax ExemptionWashington County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1290Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate InformationDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1324
    (SB0778)
Public Utilities - Natural Gas Infrastructure Expansion and ReinforcementDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1388Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1588Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response TripsDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0292Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for RefundSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0520 / CH0397
    (HB0756)
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and RefundWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0778
    (HB1324)
Public Utilities - Natural Gas Infrastructure Expansion and ReinforcementSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0870
    (HB0406)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.