Gangs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102
    (SB0198)
Criminal Gang Offenses – Penalties, Procedure, and ElementsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0198
    (HB0102)
Criminal Gang Offenses - Penalties, Procedure, and ElementsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

March 22, 2018 3:29 P.M.