Gifts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091Income Tax Checkoff for Wounded Warrior ProgramsDelegate StiflerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0259Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of ContributionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0568General Assembly - Members - Constituent Services FundDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0620Campaign Finance - Contributions - DisclosureDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0750Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax CheckoffChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0763
    (SB0736 / CH0311)
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for DeductibleSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0849
    (SB0579)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0925
    (SB0572)
Maryland Early Learning Challenge and School Readiness Act (Race to the Tots)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0963 / CH0395Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship ProgramsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1249Baltimore City - School Construction - Block GrantsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1390 / CH0681Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - EstablishmentChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0431 / CH0266Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-EndowmentsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0572
    (HB0925)
Maryland Early Learning Challenge and School Readiness Act (Race to the Tots)Senator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0665Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0736 / CH0311
    (HB0763)
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for DeductibleSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0772Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder PreferenceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0869Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and BeveragesSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1056Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - DisclosureSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.