Good Samaritan

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0370
    (SB0354)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0612Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0687
    (SB0539 / CH0569)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in DeathSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1082 / CH0573
    (SB1060 / CH0574)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1321Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1379Courts - Criminal and Civil Immunity - Prescribing, Dispensing, and Administering Opioid AntagonistsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1436Civil Actions - Duty to Render AssistanceDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1549Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0354
    (HB0370)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0443Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - ImmunitySenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0539 / CH0569
    (HB0687)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - FentanylPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 1, 2017 9:04 A.M.