Guardians

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0168 / CH0196)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsDelegate VitaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0257 / CH0094St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership RequirementsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0715
    (SB0620)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0809Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from DisqualificationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1012 / CH0260
    (SB0414 / CH0259)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1481
    (SB0557 / CH0287)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0168 / CH0196
    (HB0008)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0414 / CH0259
    (HB1012 / CH0260)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0450Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health ServicesAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0456
    (HB1312)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0557 / CH0287
    (HB1481)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0620
    (HB0715)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0649Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.