Guardians

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031
    (SB0272 / CH0151)
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0051Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip BoxesDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0179 / CH0087Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - MembershipChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0315 / CH0096
    (SB0396)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Judiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0413 / CH0400Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models ListDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0427 / CH0403Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness ActDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0467 / CH0100Labor and Employment - Employment of MinorsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0559 / CH0345
    (SB0818 / CH0344)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0656
    (SB0321 / CH0291)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0705
    (SB0940 / CH0207)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0810Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary DutyDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0958
    (SB0411)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0034
    (HB0283)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0144 / CH0039Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0321 / CH0291
    (HB0656)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0396
    (HB0315 / CH0096)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipSenator Jones-RodwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0411
    (HB0958)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0681Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0818 / CH0344
    (HB0559 / CH0345)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0940 / CH0207
    (HB0705)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.