Harassment

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042
    (SB0527)
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2015Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0043Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0073 / CH0396
    (SB0192)
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015Delegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0229
    (SB0604 / CH0043)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0448
    (SB0394)
Criminal Law - HazingDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0612Criminal Law - Stalking - Included ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0667Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0761Criminal Law - Cyberstalking - PenaltiesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0833
    (SB0558)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With DealersDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0853Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0863Criminal Law - Hazing - Elements and PenaltiesDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1078
    (SB0559)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1198
    (SB0882 / CH0130)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0018State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0192
    (HB0073 / CH0396)
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015Senator PinskyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0374 / CH0165
    (HB0405)
Maryland False Claims ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0394
    (HB0448)
Criminal Law - HazingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0527
    (HB0042)
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0558
    (HB0833)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0559
    (HB1078)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0604 / CH0043
    (HB0229)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0882 / CH0130
    (HB1198)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.