Harassment

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0328
    (SB0121 / CH0501)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0368Institutions of Higher Education - Hazing - Required Reporting and EducationDelegate GibsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0700 / CH0498Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Group VictimDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 498Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1228 / CH0788Equal Employment Opportunity Program - Sexual Harassment ReportingDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 788Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1239Labor and Employment - Sexual Harassment - Contractual WaiversDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1342 / CH0525
    (SB1138)
State Government – Discrimination and HarassmentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1379Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct - Penalty for Parent or GuardianDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1382Public Schools - Student Misconduct - Parent or Guardian LiabilityDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1423 / CH0791State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - RequiredDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 791Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1596 / CH0738
    (SB1010 / CH0739)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Delegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 738Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1600 / CH0496Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task ForceBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1611Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1695Crimes – Hate Crimes – DefacementDelegate ChangIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1698Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - EstablishedDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0121 / CH0501
    (HB0328)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0123Firearms - Prohibited Possession - Conviction for HarassmentSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0525Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory HarassmentSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0528 / CH0499Criminal Law - Hate Crimes Group VictimSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 499Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0725 / CH0366Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School ResponseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0726Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)Senator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0904Public Schools – Social Media Use by EducatorsSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1010 / CH0739
    (HB1596 / CH0738)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Senator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 739Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1031Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data ProtectionSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1138
    (HB1342 / CH0525)
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual HarassmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.