Health Services Cost Review Commission

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0585
    (HB0553)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.