Heating and Cooling

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1287
    (SB0867)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible SourcesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1568
    (SB0954)
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License RequirementsDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1569
    (SB0684)
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration ServicesDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1611Income Tax Credit - HVAC Energy Efficiency TechnologyDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0106 / CH0349Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the SecretaryChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0684
    (HB1569)
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration ServicesSenator AstleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0867
    (HB1287)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible SourcesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0954
    (HB1568)
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Maintenance Technician - License RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.