Higher Education Commission

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0413
    (SB0319 / CH0591)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0426 / CH0589
    (SB0311 / CH0588)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0427Public Institutions of Higher Education - Public Health Advisories - Required CommunicationDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0715 / CH0328Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and ApprovalChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0868
    (SB0869)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0931Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0971
    (SB0872 / CH0612)
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant ProgramDelegate EbersoleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1142Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1289Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - NotificationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1366Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - DisclosureDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1595 / CH0847
    (SB1127 / CH0848)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847Appropriations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0319 / CH0591
    (HB0413)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0712Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0730Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0869
    (HB0868)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0872 / CH0612
    (HB0971)
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant ProgramSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1127 / CH0848
    (HB1595 / CH0847)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1173Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.