High Voltage Lines

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0554 / CH0501
    (SB0563 / CH0500)
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of ApplicationsDelegate SchuhApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB1152Electric Reliability - Priorities and FundingDelegate Miller, W.In the Senate - Favorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1238
    (SB0853)
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility PolesDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0563 / CH0500
    (HB0554 / CH0501)
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of ApplicationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0853
    (HB1238)
Utility Companies - Removal of Lines from Utility PolesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.