Highway Administration, State

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0176 / CH0710
    (SB0299)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0411
    (SB0418)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0534 / CH0136
    (SB0098)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0543State Highway Administration - Watkins Mill Road Interchange ProjectDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0578
    (SB0338)
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid BeaconsDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0583
    (SB0421)
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development LimitationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing canceledEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0830 / CH0755
    (SB0386)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0951 / CH0711
    (SB1157 / CH0712)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1035 / CH0077
    (SB0558 / CH0076)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling PermitDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1133Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and SignsDelegate WivellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1199
    (SB0865)
Vehicle Laws - School Zone Crosswalks - Traffic Control SignalsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1251The Roadkill Bill of 2017Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1334 / CH0761State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative TreatmentsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1374State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0098
    (HB0534 / CH0136)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueSenator ReillyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0299
    (HB0176 / CH0710)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0328 / CH0555State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks WaySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0338
    (HB0578)
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid SignalsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0386
    (HB0830 / CH0755)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0418
    (HB0411)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0421
    (HB0583)
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development LimitationSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0430State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0431Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming RightsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0535Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. HighwaySenator SallingIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0558 / CH0076
    (HB1035 / CH0077)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling PermitSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0865
    (HB1199)
Vehicle Laws - School Zone Crosswalks - Traffic Control SignalsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1097Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of SykesvilleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1157 / CH0712
    (HB0951 / CH0711)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 712Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:44 A.M.