Holidays and Special Dates

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0252
    (SB0390 / CH0251)
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task ForceDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Health and Government Operations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0034 / CH0347
    (SB0017)
State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage MonthDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0037
    (SB0175 / CH0199)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Centenarians DayDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0077 / CH0607
    (SB0007)
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage MonthDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0167 / CH0352
    (SB0042 / CH0436)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DayDelegate IveyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0665 / CH0131State Personnel - Law Enforcement Employees - Extra CompensationDelegate DeBoyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0707
    (SB0118)
State Government - Commemorative Day - Young Heroes DayDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1016
    (SB0856)
Education - Public School Holidays - Easter MondayDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1049
    (SB0152)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Youth Political Awareness DayDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1069Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayDelegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1341State Government - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom DayDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1352State Government - Commemorative Days - Earth HourDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1502
    (SB0963 / CH0336)
Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public SchoolsDelegate HealeyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1535
    (SB1067 / CH0603)
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate JonesIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0007
    (HB0077 / CH0607)
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage MonthSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0017
    (HB0034 / CH0347)
State Government - Commemorative Day - German-American Heritage DaySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0042 / CH0436
    (HB0167 / CH0352)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DaySenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0118
    (HB0707)
State Government - Commemorative Day - Young Heroes DaySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0152
    (HB1049)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Youth Political Awareness DaySenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0175 / CH0199
    (HB0037)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Centenarians DaySenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0255State Government - Commemorative Days - Rare Disease DaySenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0390 / CH0251
    (HB0009 / CH0252)
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task ForceSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0856
    (HB1016)
Education - Public School Holidays - Easter MondaySenator MontgomeryIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0963 / CH0336
    (HB1502)
Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public SchoolsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1067 / CH0603
    (HB1535)
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.