Hospices

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1159 / CH0670Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs FacilitiesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.