Hotels and Motels

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0131
    (SB0302 / CH0289)
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License MC 18-14Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0142
    (SB0300 / CH0483)
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses MC 14-14Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0144 / CH0586
    (SB0307)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0248 / CH0219Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0323 / CH0312
    (SB0613 / CH0311)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient ChargeFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0472
    (SB0618 / CH0313)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Inn LicensesFrederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0947 / CH0495Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Delegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Public Safety (E4)
HB1265
    (SB0212 / CH0474)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Delegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1409 / CH0456Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of AnnapolisAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1515Sales and Use Tax - Definition of Taxable PriceDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0212 / CH0474
    (HB1265)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations Human Relations (D5)
SB0300 / CH0483
    (HB0142)
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) LicensesMontgomery County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0302 / CH0289
    (HB0131)
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale LicenseMontgomery County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0307
    (HB0144 / CH0586)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesMontgomery County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0401 / CH0494Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Senator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0613 / CH0311
    (HB0323 / CH0312)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient ChargeSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0618 / CH0313
    (HB0472)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Inn LicensesSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0792Business Regulation - Lodging Establishments - Bedbug RemediationSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1075Public Safety - Hotels - Carbon Monoxide AlarmsSenator ConwayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.