Housing and Community Development, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Human Relations (D5)
HB0431Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction ProjectsDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0450
    (SB0486 / CH0511)
Income Tax Credit - Endow MarylandDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedWays and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0451 / CH0228Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food DesertsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0453 / CH0229Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency ActChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0553 / CH0410Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan ProgramChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0728
    (SB0222)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB0794 / CH0425
    (SB0794)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1078Task Force on Homeownership StrategyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0222
    (HB0728)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0450Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0486 / CH0511
    (HB0450)
Income Tax Credit - Endow MarylandSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0794
    (HB0794 / CH0425)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectSenator ReillyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0850 / CH0561
    (HB1346)
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related StudySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0904Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.