Housing and Community Development, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0033Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose ProjectsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0066Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0182 / CH0075Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage LoansDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0323 / CH0239
    (SB0262)
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy CodesDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0335Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0420
    (SB0480)
Commission on Rental Housing StabilizationDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0782 / CH0455
    (SB0408)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1210Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of ModificationsDelegate CassillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0058Housing and Community Development - Notice of Proposed ProjectsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0262
    (HB0323 / CH0239)
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy CodesSenator JenningsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0408
    (HB0782 / CH0455)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0480
    (HB0420)
Commission on Rental Housing StabilizationSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.