Howard County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0230 / CH0088Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Breweries and Micro-BreweriesDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0450 / CH0116Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Renovated, Upgraded, or Rehabilitated Property Ho. Co. 11-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0454Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0455 / CH0117Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0456
    (SB0559)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property Restoration Ho. Co. 5-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0457
    (SB0562)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0460
    (SB0560)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc's Homewood Road Renovation Ho. Co. 2-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0461
    (SB0558)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0462
    (SB0561)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Blandair Regional Park Ho. Co. 4-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0901 / CH0142Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Establishments - Distance from SchoolsHoward County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1196Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Howard County - Symphony Woods ParkDelegate GuzzoneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1240 / CH0149Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1404
    (SB0992)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1405Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Brewery License Ho. Co. 17-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1406 / CH0416
    (SB0003)
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1407 / CH0153Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1409Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1419Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood CenterHoward County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1514 / CH0421Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1533Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation BoardDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0003
    (HB1406 / CH0416)
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary IncreaseSenator RobeyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0558
    (HB0461)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence CenterHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0559
    (HB0456)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property RestorationHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0560
    (HB0460)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc's Homewood Road RenovationHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0561
    (HB0462)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Blandair Regional ParkHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0562
    (HB0457)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental AreaHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0992
    (HB1404)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.