Human Rights

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0358
    (SB0270)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0559 / CH0345
    (SB0818 / CH0344)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0577
    (SB1018)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0608
    (SB0819)
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and AwarenessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0696Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Delegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1227Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety CheckpointsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HJ0002
    (SJ0001 / JR0003)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsRules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0078Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Senator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0270
    (HB0358)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0818 / CH0344
    (HB0559 / CH0345)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0819
    (HB0608)
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and AwarenessSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1018
    (HB0577)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesSenator ReillyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator FroshSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0002Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War IISenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0007Human TraffickingSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.