Human Rights

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0255 / CH0159
    (SB0349 / CH0158)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0258
    (SB0221)
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Third Reading Passed (130-0)Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0276
    (SB0222)
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of LimitationsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0372Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0502
    (SB0480)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0632 / CH0152
    (SB0308 / CH0151)
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0673Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records, Human Trafficking Awareness Training, and Hourly AccommodationsDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0808
    (SB0660)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1135Public Institutions of Higher Education - Instructors - Expressions of OpinionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1202
    (SB1018)
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and WorkgroupDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1219 / CH0157
    (SB0912 / CH0156)
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex TraffickingChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1279
    (SB0220)
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1519
    (SB0471)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquityDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HJ0005Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964Delegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate GainesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0220
    (HB1279)
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human TraffickingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0221
    (HB0258)
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsSenator LeeIn the House - Passed EnrolledJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0222
    (HB0276)
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0271Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0272
    (HB0279)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0308 / CH0151
    (HB0632 / CH0152)
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0349 / CH0158
    (HB0255 / CH0159)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0471
    (HB1519)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0480
    (HB0502)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0660
    (HB0808)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0912 / CH0156
    (HB1219 / CH0157)
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex TraffickingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1017 / CH0164Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset ExtensionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1018
    (HB1202)
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of WorkgroupSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:03 P.M.