Hunting

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007
    (SB0182)
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry OrganizationsDelegate MautzIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0091Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear ExceptionDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0119 / CH0110Calvert County – Hunting – Deer Management PermitsDelegate ClarkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0172 / CH0123Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0636Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1118
    (SB0341)
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent PinkDelegate AdamsIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1122
    (SB0959)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1163Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - ReciprocityDelegate AdamsIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1338
    (SB0817)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1429Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1440Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance FeeDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1561Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear ExceptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1699
    (SB1166)
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0094Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and MammalsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0113 / CH0062Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount ProgramChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0182
    (HB0007)
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry OrganizationsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0183Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - DonationsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Second Reading PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0341
    (HB1118)
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent PinkSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0571Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0817
    (HB1338)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0959
    (HB1122)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1166
    (HB1699)
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 17, 2018 11:48 A.M.